+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB217 is now Act 624
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. Sample
+ − Votes (2)
March 27, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 11
March 26, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor