+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB206 is now Act 289
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Irvin
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
February 8, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor