+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB203 is now Act 503
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement and Social Security Programs
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 8
February 28, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor