+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB197 is now Act 472
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3
- Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment S3
Sponsored by B. Ballinger
Amendment S2
Sponsored by B. Ballinger
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. Ballinger
+ − Votes (2)
March 13, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 15
February 21, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1