+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB197 is now Act 336
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement & Social Security Programs
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- Rules suspended.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement & Social Security Programs
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by R. Thompson
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 9
March 5, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor