+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB194 is now Act 48
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Select Committee on Rules
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Amendment #1 withdrawn
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
February 16, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
February 10, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 13
February 7, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (122)
Type:
Primary Sponsor