+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB193 is now Act 1136
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
April 9, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 9
March 26, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35