+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
- Died on Senate Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
On December 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. Hutchinson
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor