+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB187 is now Act 550
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement and Social Security Programs
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement and Social Security Programs
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Hester
+ − Votes (3)
March 14, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 25
March 14, 2017: EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 20
March 7, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor