+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate.
- Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Dalby
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Dalby
+ − Vote
February 4, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor