+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
- Sine Die adjournment
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 5 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 5
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
- Filed
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment S5
Sponsored by Elliott
Amendment S4
Sponsored by Elliott
Amendment S3
Sponsored by Elliott
Amendment S2
Sponsored by Elliott
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Elliott
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor