+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
- Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- The vote by which SB178 Failed to Pass was expunged.
- Motion to Expunge the Vote
- Read the third time and failed.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S2
Sponsored by T. Garner
Amendment S1
Sponsored by T. Garner
+ − Vote
March 26, 2019: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor