+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB174 is now Act 290
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement and Social Security Programs
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S2
Sponsored by Teague
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Teague
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 8
March 2, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor