+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB162 is now Act 1399
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as Passed, Emergency Clause having Failed of Adoption
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate as passed, having failed the Emergency Clause
On April 6, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to rerefer SB 162 failed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
- Emergency Clause failed of adoption.
- Without objection, SB162 ordered not to transmit.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement & Social Security Programs
- Filed
+ − Votes (4)
April 6, 2013: Motion to rerefer SB 162 failed.
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 55
- Present/NV: 16
April 6, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 20
April 6, 2013: Emergency Clause failed of adoption.
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 21
March 26, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor