+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB160 is now Act 611
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 4
- Amendment # 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment S4
Sponsored by Hester
Amendment S3
Sponsored by Hester
Amendment S2
Sponsored by Hester
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Hester
+ − Votes (2)
April 6, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 10
March 29, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (54)
Type:
Primary Sponsor