+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB160 is now Act 199
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. Ballinger
+ − Votes (2)
February 19, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 6
February 6, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor