+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB159 is now Act 109
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
+ − Votes (2)
February 11, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 10
January 30, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor