+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB148 is now Act 392
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- The vote by which SB 148 passed was EXPUNGED.
- MOTION to re-vote.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by G. Stubblefield
+ − Votes (3)
February 27, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 15
February 16, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 2
February 16, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor