+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and failed.
- Notice of Reconsideration given.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion for Immediate Consideration
- Read the third time and failed.
- EXPUNGED
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. Ballinger
+ − Votes (2)
February 26, 2019: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 1
February 21, 2019: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor