+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB144 is now Act 520
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement & Social Security Programs
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Committee on Public Retirement & Social Security Programs
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. Key
+ − Votes (2)
March 26, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 85
- Present/NV: 15
March 19, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor