+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB140 is now Act 369
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. English
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 2
February 18, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor