+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB135 is now Act 179
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 14, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 20
February 7, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor