+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB127 is now Act 1159
- Notification that SB127 is now Act 1159
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
- Returned To Senate as Passed.
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 30, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 7
March 24, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor