+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB125 is now Act 79
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. Sturch
+ − Votes (2)
February 3, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 3
January 26, 2021: Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor