+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB121 is now Act 1306
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- Rules suspended.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
April 16, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 16
January 30, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35