+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB121 is now Act 215
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 28, 2018: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 8
February 27, 2018: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Joint Budget Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor