+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB1159 is now Act 1436
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Rules suspended.
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H1
Sponsored by J. Burris
Amendment S1
Sponsored by D. Sanders
+ − Votes (3)
April 19, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 87
- Present/NV: 13
April 19, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
April 17, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor