+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
- Sine Die adjournment
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3
- Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment S3
Sponsored by B. Ballinger
Amendment S2
Sponsored by B. Ballinger
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. Ballinger