+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB114 is now Act 514
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Read the third time and passed.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Hammer
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
March 7, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 80
- Present/NV: 20