+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB1137 is now Act 1045
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Broadaway
+ − Votes (3)
April 5, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
April 4, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 27
March 14, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor