+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB113 is now Act 107
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S2
Sponsored by Rapert
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Rapert
+ − Votes (2)
February 11, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8
February 4, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor