+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB112 is now Act 213
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
+ − Votes (2)
February 20, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 4
January 31, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor