+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate.
- Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment 2 Withdrawn
- Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Rules suspended.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Filed
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Hester
Amendment S2
Sponsored by Hester
Amendment S3
Sponsored by Hester
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Ballinger
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Ballinger
+ − Vote
April 2, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor