+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB111 is now Act 721
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S2
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
+ − Votes (2)
March 29, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 14
March 26, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsor
Joint Budget Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor