+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB108 is now Act 337
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Rules suspended.
- Read the third time and passed.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 2
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Sullivan
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
February 4, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 6
January 24, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 32
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor