+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB108 is now Act 289
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 22, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 10
February 21, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Joint Budget Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor