+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate.
- Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Files
+ − Vote
April 4, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor