+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sine Die adjournment
- Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
- Received from the House.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate.
- Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and failed.
- Motion by Representative Pilkington to expunge SB107 vote passed
- The vote by which SB107 Failed to Pass was expunged.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 11, 2019: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 40
February 5, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor