+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB107 is now Act 260
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as Passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass.
- RULES SUSPENDED
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Joint Budget Committee
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Joint Budget Committee
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S2
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Joint Budget Committee
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2014: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 21
March 5, 2014: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Joint Budget Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor