+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB1059 is now Act 569
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 28, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 29
March 20, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor