+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB1024 is now Act 1421
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology and Legislative Affairs
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by K. Ingram
+ − Votes (2)
April 17, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 15
April 9, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor