+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (58)
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB1020 is now Act 1497
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- House Amendment No. 3 and 4 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3 and 4
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- Rules suspended.
- Read the third time and passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- ORDERED ENROLLED
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate as requested.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- returned from the Governor's office as requested
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar.
- The vote by which SB1020 passed on April 16 was expunged
- Returned To the House as requested.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment No. 4 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- The vote by which SB1020 Passed was expunged.
- Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3 and 4.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 3 and 4.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 and 2
- Rules suspended.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Rules suspended.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- Returned from the House as Passed as Amended, Emergency Clause having Failed of Adoption
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate as passed, as amended #1 and #2, with Emergency Clause failed of adoption.
- Emergency Clause failed of adoption.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 and 2.
On April 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- Rules suspended.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- Filed
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment H4
Sponsored by J. Burris
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Bookout
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Westerman
Amendment H3
Sponsored by J. Burris
Amendment H1
Sponsored by J. Burris
+ − Votes (9)
April 18, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
April 17, 2013: The vote by which SB1020 Passed was expunged.
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 16
April 17, 2013: Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 4
April 17, 2013: Amendment No. 4 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 4
April 17, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 7
April 16, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 7
April 11, 2013: Emergency Clause failed of adoption.
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 33
- Present/NV: 7
April 11, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 35
- Present/NV: 2
April 5, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2