+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB1012 is now Act 1138
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S2
Sponsored by Irvin
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Irvin
+ − Votes (2)
March 30, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 21
March 26, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor