+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB1005 is now Act 1174
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. Dismang
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 88
- Present/NV: 12
March 21, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor