+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB10 is now Act 71
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned from the House as passed.
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
On November 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
January 26, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
January 19, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor