+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB10 is now Act 463
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
On December 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Petty
+ − Votes (3)
March 12, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
March 5, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 16
January 24, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor