+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB1 is now Act 71
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Senate Efficiency
Type:
Primary Sponsor