+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- READ AND ADOPTED.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment H3
Sponsored by A. Davis
Amendment H2
Sponsored by A. Davis
Amendment H1
Sponsored by A. Davis
+ − Vote
April 10, 2019: READ AND ADOPTED.
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 17
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor