+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From Senate concurred in.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as concurred in.
- Resolution read and concurred in.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
- Received from the House.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor