+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- READ AND ADOPTED.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Sorvillo
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Sorvillo
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor